CA AB114 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 28 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-09-12 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Lara.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 28 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-09-12 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Lara.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 6 (commencing with Section 26250) to Division 16.3 of the Public Resources Code, relating to energy.
Title
Proposition 39: implementation: workforce development.
Sponsors
Asm. Rudy Salas [D] | Asm. Manuel Perez [D] | Asm. Luis Alejo [D] | Asm. Cheryl Brown [D] |
Asm. Jimmy Gomez [D] | Asm. Chris Holden [D] | Asm. Henry Perea [D] | Asm. Sharon Quirk-Silva [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-07-02 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-12 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Energy, Utilities and Communications (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-28 - Assembly - AB 114 SALAS Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-15 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Utilities and Commerce (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-06-12 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Energy, Utilities and Communications (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-28 - Assembly - AB 114 SALAS Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-15 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Utilities and Commerce (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-09-12 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Lara. |
2013-08-28 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-08-27 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2013-08-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-08-19 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2013-07-25 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-07-09 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-07-08 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (July 2). |
2013-06-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E., U., & C. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on L. & I.R. and E., U., & C. |
2013-05-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2013-05-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 2. Page 1660.) |
2013-05-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 24). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-15 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2013-05-09 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-05-08 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2013-05-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 29). |
2013-04-24 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on U. & C. |
2013-04-23 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2013-04-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 15). |
2013-04-10 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2013-04-09 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2013-02-28 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and U. & C. |
2013-01-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 14. |
2013-01-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 26225 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 26240 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 26243 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 26250 | New Code | See Bill Text |