CA AB1102 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 684, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 684, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 4999.2 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to healing arts.
Title
Telephone medical advice services.
Sponsors
Asm. Evan Low [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-08-31 - Assembly - AB 1102 Low Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1102 Low By Pan (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-12 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Assembly - AB 1102 Low Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1102 Low By Pan (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-12 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Assembly - AB 1102 Low Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 684, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-09-13 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2022-08-31 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0.). |
2022-08-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2022-08-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0.). |
2022-08-17 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-16 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-08-15 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | From inactive file. |
2021-09-10 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Hertzberg. |
2021-07-15 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2021-07-15 | Senate | From Consent Calendar. |
2021-07-13 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2021-07-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (July 12). |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2021-04-08 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-04-08 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 930.) |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2021-03-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-03-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (March 23). |
2021-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2021-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2021-02-18 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 4999.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |