CA AB1098 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Hearing: Apr 24 @ 1:30 pm in State Capitol, Room 126
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Division 10.4 (commencing with Section 11740) to the Health and Safety Code, relating to substance use disorders.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Substance use disorders: youth programs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Education] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-12AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
2019-04-10AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on ED.
2019-04-02AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2019-04-01AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
2019-03-21AssemblyReferred to Coms. on HEALTH and ED.
2019-02-22AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
2019-02-21AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code11740New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback