CA AB1098 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-28 - Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-28 - Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 12012.63 to the Government Code, relating to tribal gaming.
Title
Tribal gaming: compact ratification.
Sponsors
Asm. Adam Gray [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-08-12 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-07-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Environmental Quality (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-29 - Assembly - AB 1098 QUIRK-SILVA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-07-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Environmental Quality (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-29 - Assembly - AB 1098 QUIRK-SILVA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-28 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2014-05-27 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2013-09-11 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2013-09-10 | Senate | Senate Rule 29.3(b) suspended. (Ayes 23. Noes 5. Page 2304.) From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-08-30 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2013-08-13 | Senate | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2013-07-09 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-07-08 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 3). |
2013-06-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and E.Q. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2013-05-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1700.) |
2013-05-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 24). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-15 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2013-05-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-05-01 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2013-04-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 23). |
2013-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E. |
2013-03-21 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on J., E.D., & E. Read second time and amended. |
2013-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2013-02-24 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 26. |
2013-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 16000 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 6126.10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 12012.63 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 12098.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |