CA AB1090 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 650, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 650, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1091.5 of, and to add Sections 1097.1, 1097.2, 1097.3, 1097.4, and 1097.5 to, the Government Code, relating to public officers.
Title
Public officers: conflicts of interest: contracts.
Sponsors
Asm. Paul Fong [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-09-12 - Assembly - AB 1090 FONG Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 71 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1090 Fong By Torres (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-07-02 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-31 - Assembly - AB 1090 FONG Assembly Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1090 Fong By Torres (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-07-02 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-31 - Assembly - AB 1090 FONG Assembly Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-10-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 650, Statutes of 2013. | |
2013-10-08 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2013-09-26 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. |
2013-09-12 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 71. Noes 4. Page 3301.). |
2013-09-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2013-09-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2358.). |
2013-08-30 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-08-29 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2013-08-13 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-08-12 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2013-07-03 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2013-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 58. Noes 13. Page 1878.) |
2013-05-13 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 8). |
2013-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-04-11 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2013-04-10 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended. |
2013-03-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2013-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2013-02-24 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 26. |
2013-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 1091.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 1097 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 1097.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 1097.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 1097.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 1097.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 1097.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |