CA AB1068 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 713, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 713, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 49073 and 49076 of the Education Code, relating to pupil records.
Title
Pupil records.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-09-10 - Assembly - AB 1068 BLOOM Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1068 Bloom By Pavley (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-12 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-29 - Assembly - AB 1068 BLOOM Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1068 Bloom By Pavley (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-12 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-29 - Assembly - AB 1068 BLOOM Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-10-10 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 713, Statutes of 2013. | |
2013-10-10 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2013-09-20 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2013-09-10 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 3064.) Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 3064.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3081.). |
2013-09-09 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2013-09-09 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2259.). |
2013-09-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-09-04 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2013-09-03 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-08-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 30). |
2013-08-13 | Senate | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2013-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2013-05-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1697.) |
2013-05-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 24). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-04-17 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2013-04-04 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-04-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2013-04-01 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. |
2013-03-07 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2013-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2013-02-24 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 26. |
2013-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 49073 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 49076 | Amended Code | Citation Text |