CA AB106 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-24 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Mitchell.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-24 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Mitchell.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 19829.9848, 19829.9849, 19829.9850, 20677.5, 20683.71, 20683.9, 20683.91, and 22944.5 of, and to add Sections 19829.9851, 19829.9852, 20677.5.1, and 20683.81.3 to, the Government Code, relating to state employment, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
State employment: State Bargaining Units.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Assembly - AB 106 Ting Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 13 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Assembly - AB 106 Ting Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 13 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-24 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Mitchell. |
2020-07-31 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-07-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (July 30). |
2020-07-27 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2019-06-17 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-06-12 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-06-10 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 13. Page 1180.) |
2019-04-08 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | Ordered to second reading. |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 15. Page 1032.) |
2019-01-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2018-12-04 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee January 3. |
2018-12-03 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 19829.9848 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 19829.9849 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 19829.9850 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 19829.9851 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 19829.9852 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 20677.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 20677.5.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 20683.71 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 20683.81.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 20683.9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 20683.91 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 22944.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |