CA AB1046 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 23398.5 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to alcoholic beverages.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Licenses: sale of soju or shochu.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-01AssemblyFrom committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
2018-01-31AssemblyDied pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
2017-04-19AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-04-17AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2017-03-06AssemblyReferred to Com. on G.O.
2017-02-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
2017-02-16AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code23398.5Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback