CA AB1040 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-01 - Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-01 - Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act relating to state employees, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
State employees: memorandum of understanding.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-01 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |
2011-03-14 | Referred to Com. on P.E., R. & S.S. | |
2011-02-20 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. | |
2011-02-18 | Read first time. To print. |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_1040&sess=1112&house=A |
Text | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_1001-1050/ab_1040_bill_20110218_introduced.html |