CA AB1038 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-08-26 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Chapter 1.7 (commencing with Section 200) to Part 1 of Division 1 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to public health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

California Health Equity Program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-08-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-07 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - AB 1038 Gipson Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-08-26SenateIn committee: Held under submission.
2021-08-16SenateIn committee: Referred to suspense file.
2021-07-12SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-07-08SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 7).
2021-06-16SenateReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2021-06-02SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2021-06-01AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 2.)
2021-05-24AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-05-20AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 1.) (May 20).
2021-04-28AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2021-04-21AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 1.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-03-26AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2021-03-25AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
2021-03-25AssemblyReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2021-02-19AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
2021-02-18AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code200New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback