CA AB1035 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-03 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-03 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 42704.6 to the Public Resources Code, relating to transportation.
Title
Department of Transportation and local agencies: streets and highways: recycled materials.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-09-08 - Assembly - AB 1035 Salas Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-09-07 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1035 Salas et al. By Skinner (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Assembly - AB 1035 Salas Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-07 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1035 Salas et al. By Skinner (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Assembly - AB 1035 Salas Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-03 | Assembly | Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file. |
2022-01-03 | Assembly | Consideration of Governor's veto pending. |
2021-10-08 | Assembly | Vetoed by Governor. |
2021-09-15 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m. | |
2021-09-08 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2921.). |
2021-09-08 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 59. Noes 17. Page 2875.) |
2021-09-07 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 9 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2021-09-07 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2459.). |
2021-09-02 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-09-01 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2021-09-01 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2021-09-01 | Senate | From special consent calendar. |
2021-08-31 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2021-08-26 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 26). |
2021-07-15 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-06-24 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 24). |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2021-05-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-05-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 1654.) |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 20). |
2021-05-05 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2021-04-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2021-04-05 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2021-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2021-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2021-02-18 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 42704.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |