CA AB1025 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-14 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Accountability and Administrative Review Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 58595 of the Food and Agricultural Code, relating to agricultural products.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Institutional purchasers: purchase of domestic agricultural food products.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-14AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2021-03-22AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
2021-03-18AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. Read second time and amended.
2021-03-18AssemblyReferred to Coms. on A. & A.R. and AGRI.
2021-02-19AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
2021-02-18AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Food and Agricultural Code58595Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback