CA AB102 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 902, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 902, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 48800 and 76004 of the Education Code, relating to community colleges.
Title
Pupil attendance at community colleges: College and Career Access Pathways partnerships: county offices of education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-31 - Assembly - AB 102 Holden Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-31 - Senate - Special Consent AB102 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - Assembly - AB 102 Holden Assembly Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Education] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-31 - Senate - Special Consent AB102 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - Assembly - AB 102 Holden Assembly Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Education] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 902, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-09-13 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2022-08-31 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0.). |
2022-08-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2022-08-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 5365.). |
2022-08-30 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2022-08-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-22 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-08-15 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 11). |
2022-06-13 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2022-06-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-05-18 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2022-01-25 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-01-24 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 66. Noes 0. Page 3367.) |
2022-01-24 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 48. Noes 16. Page 3365.) |
2022-01-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-01-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (January 20). |
2022-01-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (January 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-01-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2022-01-03 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. |
2021-03-26 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2021-03-24 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (March 24). |
2021-03-16 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2021-03-15 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended. |
2021-01-11 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HIGHER ED. and ED. |
2021-01-11 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2020-12-12 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee January 11. |
2020-12-11 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 48800 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 76004 | Amended Code | Citation Text |