CA AB1001 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-14 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Environmental Quality Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-14 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Environmental Quality Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 21081.8 and 21098.5 to the Public Resources Code, relating to the environment.
Title
Environment: mitigation measures for air quality impacts: environmental justice.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-31 - Assembly - AB 1001 Cristina Garcia Assembly Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - Assembly - AB 1001 Cristina Garcia Assembly Second Reading Amendment Set #1 (Y: 48 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - Assembly - AB 1001 Cristina Garcia Assembly Second Reading Amendment Set #1 (Y: 48 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-14 | Senate | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-06-10 | Senate | 6-16-2022 hearing rescheduled by committee to 6-15-2022 |
2022-06-06 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-05-23 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2022-03-22 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2022-02-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-01-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 43. Noes 24. Page 3431.) |
2022-01-24 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 48. Noes 16. Page 3364.) |
2022-01-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-01-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (January 20). |
2022-01-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (January 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-01-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2022-01-03 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2021-04-28 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2021-04-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2021-04-20 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2021-03-16 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2021-03-15 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2021-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2021-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2021-02-18 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 21081.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 21098.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |