AZ SCR1043 | 2010 | Forty-ninth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-08 - Referred to House RULES Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-08 - Referred to House RULES Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Clean elections act; repeal
Title
Clean elections act; repeal
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-08 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2010-04-08 | House JUD Committee action: Failed To Pass, voting: (4-4-0-0-0) | |
2010-03-31 | Referred to House JUD Committee | |
2010-03-31 | House read second time | |
2010-03-30 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2010-03-30 | Assigned to House JUD Committee | |
2010-03-30 | Introduced in House and read first time | |
2010-03-22 | Transmit to House | |
2010-03-22 | Senate third reading , voting: (18-11-1-0) | |
2010-03-18 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2010-03-16 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-03-16 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-03-15 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2010-02-01 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-02-15 | Senate JUD Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (4-3-0-0) | |
2010-02-02 | Referred to Senate JUD Committee | |
2010-02-02 | Senate read second time | |
2010-02-01 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-02-01 | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee | |
2010-02-01 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |