AZ SCR1031 | 2012 | Fiftieth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-22 - Referred to House RULES Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-22 - Referred to House RULES Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Statewide initiatives; periodic reauthorization
Title
Statewide initiatives; periodic reauthorization
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Antenori [R] | Sen. Nancy Barto [R] | Sen. Andy Biggs [R] | Sen. Adam Driggs [R] |
Rep. Terri Proud [R] | Sen. Steve Smith [R] | Rep. Ted Vogt [R] | Sen. Steven Yarbrough [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-22 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (FAILED) (Y: 4 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-22 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2012-03-22 | House APPROP Committee action: Failed To Pass, voting: (4-9-0-0-0) | |
2012-03-19 | Referred to House APPROP Committee | |
2012-03-19 | House JUD Committee action: Withdrawn | |
2012-03-06 | Referred to House JUD Committee | |
2012-03-06 | House read second time | |
2012-03-05 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2012-03-19 | Assigned to House APPROP Committee | |
2012-03-05 | Assigned to House JUD Committee | |
2012-03-05 | Introduced in House and read first time | |
2012-02-28 | Transmit to House | |
2012-02-28 | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (21-9-0-0) | |
2012-02-27 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass | |
2012-02-23 | Senate Consent Calendar February 23, 2012 @ 11:23 AM with Objections | |
2012-02-23 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-23 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-23 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2012-01-26 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-02-14 | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-4-0-0) | |
2012-01-30 | Referred to Senate APPROP Committee | |
2012-01-30 | Senate read second time | |
2012-01-26 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-01-26 | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee | |
2012-01-26 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |