AZ SCR1021 | 2023 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 32-17)
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Transmitted to Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

United States; Taiwan; trade partnership

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

United States; Taiwan; trade partnership

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-25 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-03 Transmitted to Secretary of State
2023-04-25HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (0-0-0-)
2023-04-25SenateTransmit to Senate
2023-04-25HouseHouse read second time
2023-04-25HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2023-03-07HouseTransmit to House
2023-03-06SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (0-0-0-)
2023-03-06SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback