AZ SCR1021 | 2010 | Forty-ninth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-16 - Referred to House ENV Committee
Pending: House Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-16 - Referred to House ENV Committee
Pending: House Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Technical correction; universities; admissions
Title
Technical correction; universities; admissions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-16 | Referred to House ENV Committee | |
2010-03-16 | House read second time | |
2010-03-15 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2010-03-15 | Assigned to House ENV Committee | |
2010-03-15 | Introduced in House and read first time | |
2010-03-08 | Transmit to House | |
2010-03-08 | Senate third reading , voting: (18-10-2-0) | |
2010-03-04 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2010-03-02 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-03-02 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-03-01 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2010-01-19 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-02-24 | Senate VMA Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (4-3-0-0) | |
2010-01-20 | Referred to Senate VMA Committee | |
2010-01-20 | Senate read second time | |
2010-01-19 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-02-22 | Assigned to Senate VMA Committee | |
2010-01-19 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |