AZ SCR1014 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-3)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-06 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-06 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Article V convention; term limits.
Title
Article V convention; term limits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-2-1-0) |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Senate GOV Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |