AZ SCR1010 | 2016 | Fifty-second Legislature 2nd Regular


Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2016 - 25% progression
Action: 2016-02-23 - Senate majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]


Photo radar prohibition

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


Photo radar prohibition


Roll Calls

2016-02-03 - Senate Public Safety, Military and Technology Committee Action (DP) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]


2016-02-23SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2016-02-23SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2016-02-15SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration
2016-01-26SenateReferred to Senate RULES Committee
2016-02-03SenateSenate PSMT Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (3-2-1-0)
2016-01-27SenateReferred to Senate PSMT Committee
2016-01-27SenateSenate read second time
2016-01-26SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2016-01-26SenateAssigned to Senate PSMT Committee
2016-01-26SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Arizona State Sources

Bill Comments