AZ SCR1006 | 2013 | Fifty-first Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-28 - Referred to House RULES Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-28 - Referred to House RULES Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Initiative petitions; filing date
Title
Initiative petitions; filing date
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-28 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-18 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-18 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-28 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2013-02-28 | House | House JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-1-0-0-0) |
2013-02-26 | House | Referred to House JUD Committee |
2013-02-26 | House | House read second time |
2013-02-25 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2013-02-25 | House | Assigned to House JUD Committee |
2013-02-25 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (18-12-0-0) |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Senate ELEC Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-2-0-0) |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Referred to Senate ELEC Committee |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ELEC Committee |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |