AZ SCR1005 | 2010 | Forty-ninth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-12 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-12 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Ronald Reagan day
Title
Ronald Reagan day
Sponsors
Rep. Judy Burges [R] | Rep. Jack Harper [R] | Sen. John Nelson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-12 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2010-04-12 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-12 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-08 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-2-0) | |
2010-03-08 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2010-04-06 | House GOV Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (5-4-0-0-0) | |
2010-03-09 | Referred to House GOV Committee | |
2010-03-09 | House read second time | |
2010-03-08 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2010-03-08 | Assigned to House GOV Committee | |
2010-03-08 | Introduced in House and read first time | |
2010-02-01 | Transmit to House | |
2010-02-01 | Senate third reading , voting: (28-0-0-0) | |
2010-01-28 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2010-01-25 | Senate Consent Calendar January 25, 2010 @ 1:38 PM with Objections | |
2010-01-26 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-01-26 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-01-25 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2010-01-11 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-01-21 | Senate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0) | |
2010-01-12 | Referred to Senate GOV Committee | |
2010-01-12 | Senate read second time | |
2010-01-11 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-01-11 | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee | |
2010-01-11 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |