AZ SCR1003 | 2014 | Fifty-first Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 19-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-12 - Senate third reading FAILED voting: (14-14-2-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-12 - Senate third reading FAILED voting: (14-14-2-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Initiatives; referendum measures; periodic reauthorization
Title
Initiatives; referendum measures; periodic reauthorization
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-17 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 15 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-12 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 14 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-18 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 14 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-18 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-12 | Senate | Senate third reading FAILED voting: (14-14-2-0) |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Senate ELEC Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-0) |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Senate ELEC Committee |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ELEC Committee |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |