AZ SCR1001 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-12 - Senate TTMC Committee action: Failed To Pass, voting: (3-3-1-0)
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-12 - Senate TTMC Committee action: Failed To Pass, voting: (3-3-1-0)
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Photo radar prohibition
Title
Photo radar prohibition
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-22 - Senate - Senate Transportation, Technology and Missing Children Committee Action (FAILED) (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-01-16 - Senate - Senate Transportation, Technology and Missing Children Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-16 - Senate - Senate Transportation, Technology and Missing Children Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-12 | Senate | Senate TTMC Committee action: Failed To Pass, voting: (3-3-1-0) |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2024-01-08 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2024-01-08 | Senate | Assigned to Senate TTMC Committee |
2024-01-08 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2023-12-11 | Senate | Prefile |
Subjects
Concurrent Resolution
Definition
Definitions
Legislative Intent
Photo Enforcement System
Photo Radar Prohibition
Powers Of Local Authorities
Prohibition
Repeal
Transportation - Title 28
Definition
Definitions
Legislative Intent
Photo Enforcement System
Photo Radar Prohibition
Powers Of Local Authorities
Prohibition
Repeal
Transportation - Title 28