AZ SCM1001 | 2014 | Fifty-first Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-24 - Transmitted to Secretary Of State
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-24 - Transmitted to Secretary Of State
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Yuma desalting plant
Title
Yuma desalting plant
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-23 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 13 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-24 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - House - House Agriculture and Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - Senate - Senate Government and Environment Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-24 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - House - House Agriculture and Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - Senate - Senate Government and Environment Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-24 | Transmitted to Secretary Of State | |
2014-04-23 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2014-04-23 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (42-13-5-0) |
2014-04-01 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2014-03-31 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-03-31 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-03-24 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-3-0) |
2014-02-20 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2014-03-11 | House | House AW Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-1-0) |
2014-02-24 | House | Referred to House AW Committee |
2014-02-24 | House | House read second time |
2014-02-20 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2014-02-20 | House | Assigned to House AW Committee |
2014-02-20 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0) |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Senate GE Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-0-2-0) |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Referred to Senate GE Committee |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GE Committee |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |