AZ SB1847 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Note: Replaces legislation HB2908
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Chapter 398
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Chapter 398
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Medical marijuana; research; mental health.
Title
Medical marijuana; research; mental health.
Sponsors
Sen. Nancy Barto [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-28 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Motion Senator Gray moved in accordance with Senate Rule 28B, I move to suspend Senate Rules 2J, 8A and B and notwithstanding Senate Rule 16, for the purpose of placing Senate Bill 1847 on the order of business, Third Reading of Bills. Motion carried. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Motion Senator Gray moved in accordance with Senate Rule 28B, I move to suspend Senate Rules 2J, 8A and B and notwithstanding Senate Rule 16, for the purpose of placing Senate Bill 1847 on the order of business, Third Reading of Bills. Motion carried. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-30 | Senate | Chapter 398 |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2021-06-28 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (55-3-2-0) |
2021-06-24 | House | Transmit to House |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (27-3-0-0) |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Senate miscellaneous motion: Senator Gray moved in accordance with Senate Rule 28B, I move to suspend Senate Rules 2J, 8A and B and notwithstanding Senate Rule 16, for the purpose of placing Senate Bill 1847 on the order of business, Third Reading of Bills. Motion carried. |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
HB2908 (Replaces) 2021-06-25 - House miscellaneous motion: Rep. Toma moved that rules be suspended and House Bill 2908 be immediately placed under the order of business Third Reading of bills for the purpose of substitution of bills on Third Reading
Subjects
Exemption (h)
Exemption From Rulemaking
Marijuana (h)
Medical Marijuana
Mental Health
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Requirements For Enactment (h)
Requirements For Enactment; Three-fourths Vote
Research
Rfeir (h)
Exemption From Rulemaking
Marijuana (h)
Medical Marijuana
Mental Health
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Requirements For Enactment (h)
Requirements For Enactment; Three-fourths Vote
Research
Rfeir (h)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
36 | 2803 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 2803.02 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 2806 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 2812 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 2817 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 2820 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |