AZ HB2908 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Note: Legislation replaced by SB1847
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-25 - House miscellaneous motion: Rep. Toma moved that rules be suspended and House Bill 2908 be immediately placed under the order of business Third Reading of bills for the purpose of substitution of bills on Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-25 - House miscellaneous motion: Rep. Toma moved that rules be suspended and House Bill 2908 be immediately placed under the order of business Third Reading of bills for the purpose of substitution of bills on Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Medical marijuana; research; mental health
Title
Medical marijuana; research; mental health
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-25 - House - Motion Rep. Toma moved that rules be suspended and House Bill 2908 be immediately placed under the order of business Third Reading of bills for the purpose of substitution of bills on Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-25 | House | House miscellaneous motion: Rep. Toma moved that rules be suspended and House Bill 2908 be immediately placed under the order of business Third Reading of bills for the purpose of substitution of bills on Third Reading |
2021-06-15 | House | House read second time |
2021-06-07 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
SB1847 (Replaced by) 2021-06-30 - Chapter 398
Subjects
Authority
Election Records
Immunity
Legislative Investigations
Legislative Subpoena
Legislature
Medical Marijuana
Medical Marijuana Act
Mental Health
Privilege
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Records
Requirements For Enactment
Requirements For Enactment; Three-fourths Vote
Research
Retroactivity
Rfeir
State Government - Title 41
Witnesses
Election Records
Immunity
Legislative Investigations
Legislative Subpoena
Legislature
Medical Marijuana
Medical Marijuana Act
Mental Health
Privilege
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Records
Requirements For Enactment
Requirements For Enactment; Three-fourths Vote
Research
Retroactivity
Rfeir
State Government - Title 41
Witnesses
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
36 | 2803 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 2803.02 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 2806 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 2812 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 2817 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 2820 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |