AZ SB1822 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular

Note: Replaces legislation HB2894

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Chapter 407
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Environment; budget reconciliation; 2021-2022

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Environment; budget reconciliation; 2021-2022

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-24 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-30SenateChapter 407
2021-06-30SenateGovernor Signed
2021-06-28SenateTransmitted to Governor
2021-06-25SenateTransmit to Senate
2021-06-24HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (31-29-0-0)
2021-06-23HouseTransmit to House
2021-06-22SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (16-14-0-0)
2021-06-22SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2021-05-26SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2021-05-26SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2021-05-26SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2021-05-25SenateSenate read second time
2021-05-25SenateSenate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-4-1-0)
2021-05-24SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2021-05-24SenateAssigned to Senate APPROP Committee
2021-05-24SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Same As/Similar To

HB2894 (Replaces) 2021-06-24 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended

Subjects

2021-2022
Adeq
Administration
Adwr
Ansac
Appropriating Monies
Appropriation
Appropriation Limit
Arizona Department Of Environmental Quality
Arizona Department Of Forestry And Fire Management
Arizona Department Of Water Resources
Arizona Navigable Stream Adjudication Commission
Arizona State Parks
Arizona State Parks Store Fund
Arizona Water Banking Fund
Arizona Water Protection Fund
Audit
Board
Board Of Directors
Budget Reconciliation
Conduct Of Office
Definition
Definitions
Department Of Environmental Quality
Dffm
Director
Drought Mitigation Board
Drought Mitigation Fund
Drought Mitigation Revolving Fund
Due Diligence Fund
Emergency Medical Services
Entity
Environment
Environment Budget Reconciliation
Exemption
Exemption From Rulemaking
Expenses
Federal Lands
Financial Assistance
Fingerprinting
Fire Districts
Fiscal Year 2019-2020
Fund
Legal Fees
Legislative Intent
Limitation
Mount Lemmon Fire District
Payment
Procedures
Public Lands - Title 37
Purpose
Purposes
Requirements
Retroactivity
Reversion
Security
State Government - Title 41
State Treasurer
Termination
The Environment - Title 49
Underground Storage Tank Revolving Fund
Use Of Monies
Vehicle Emissions Testing Fees
Water Quality Assurance Revolving Fund
Water Supply Development Revolving Fund
Wqarf

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
37110Amended CodeSee Bill Text
371305Amended CodeSee Bill Text
371310New CodeSee Bill Text
413031.01New CodeSee Bill Text
41511.24New CodeSee Bill Text
491273Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/76141
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/sb1822p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/sb1822s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/laws/0407.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/adopted/s.1822floorfann.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/proposed/s.1822floorengel0219.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/proposed/s.1822floorengel90328.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/proposed/s.1822floorgabaldon1132.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/proposed/s.1822floorotondo0213.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/proposed/s.1822floorotondo0323.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/proposed/s.1822floorotondo0747.docx.htm
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/489732
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/490074
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/490563
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=76141&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=76141&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=76141&billStatusActionId=204338&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=76141&billStatusActionId=204352&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=76141&billStatusActionId=204422&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments 750

feedback