AZ SB1715 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-23 - Assigned to House RULES Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-23 - Assigned to House RULES Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Hemp-derived manufactured impairing cannabinoids
Title
Hemp-derived manufactured impairing cannabinoids
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-15 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-23 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2022-06-23 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2022-03-15 | House | Transmit to House |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (27-1-2-0) |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-1-1-0) |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Agriculture - Title 3
Criminal Code - Title 13
Hemp-derived
Hemp-derived Manufactured Cannabinoids (h)
Manufactured Impairing Cannabinoids
Marijuana
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Requirements For Enactment (rfe)
Requirements For Enactment, Initiative Or Referendum (rfeir) (h)
Requirements For Enactment; Three-fourths Vote (h)
Rfe (see Also: Requirements For Enactment)
Rfeir (see Also: Requirements For Enactment, Initiative Or Referendum) (h)
Three-fourths Vote
Criminal Code - Title 13
Hemp-derived
Hemp-derived Manufactured Cannabinoids (h)
Manufactured Impairing Cannabinoids
Marijuana
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Requirements For Enactment (rfe)
Requirements For Enactment, Initiative Or Referendum (rfeir) (h)
Requirements For Enactment; Three-fourths Vote (h)
Rfe (see Also: Requirements For Enactment)
Rfeir (see Also: Requirements For Enactment, Initiative Or Referendum) (h)
Three-fourths Vote
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
13 | 3408 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
3 | 311 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 2801 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 2804.05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 2850 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 2856 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 2858 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |