AZ SB1698 | 2023 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-16 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on June 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-16 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Unlawful exposure; minors; sentencing; reporting
Title
Unlawful exposure; minors; sentencing; reporting
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-15 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 26 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-04-04 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-16 | Governor Vetoed | |
2023-06-12 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2023-05-15 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (31-26-2-0) |
2023-04-04 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2023-03-28 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2023-03-28 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2023-03-27 | House | House consent calendar |
2023-03-27 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-3-0-0-0-0) |
2023-03-22 | House | House JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-3-0-0-0-0) |
2023-03-08 | House | House read second time |
2023-03-07 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2023-03-07 | House | Assigned to House JUD Committee |
2023-03-07 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2023-03-03 | House | Transmit to House |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-14-0-0) |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (4-3-0-0) |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (3-1-3-0) |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Adult Oriented Businesses
Adult Oriented Performances (h)
Child Safety - Title 8
Children - Title 8 (h)
Civil Action
Confidential Information
Counties - Title 11
Courts And Civil Proceedings - Title 12
Criminal Code - Title 13
Dangerous Crimes Against Children
Definitions
Exceptions
Identification Cards
Intimate Images
Medical Records
Minors
Reporting
Sentences (h)
Sentencing
Sexual Activity
Statute Of Limitations
Unauthorized Disclosure
Unlawful Disclosure
Unlawful Exposure
Zoning (h)
Zoning Districts
Zoning Ordinance
Adult Oriented Performances (h)
Child Safety - Title 8
Children - Title 8 (h)
Civil Action
Confidential Information
Counties - Title 11
Courts And Civil Proceedings - Title 12
Criminal Code - Title 13
Dangerous Crimes Against Children
Definitions
Exceptions
Identification Cards
Intimate Images
Medical Records
Minors
Reporting
Sentences (h)
Sentencing
Sexual Activity
Statute Of Limitations
Unauthorized Disclosure
Unlawful Disclosure
Unlawful Exposure
Zoning (h)
Zoning Districts
Zoning Ordinance
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 811 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
12 | 741 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
13 | 1425 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
13 | 3508 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
13 | 3620 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
13 | 3821 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
13 | 705 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
8 | 201 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |