AZ SB1689 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Note: Replaces legislation HB2906
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-28 - Chapter 55
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-28 - Chapter 55
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Environment; budget reconciliation; 2020-2021.
Title
Environment; budget reconciliation; 2020-2021.
Sponsors
Sen. Karen Fann [R] | Sen. David Gowan [R] | Sen. Vince Leach [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-23 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-19 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-19 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (DP/PFC) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-19 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-19 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (DP/PFC) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-28 | Senate | Chapter 55 |
2020-03-28 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2020-03-23 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2020-03-23 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2020-03-23 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (60-0-0-0) |
2020-03-19 | House | Transmit to House |
2020-03-19 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (28-2-0-0) |
2020-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2020-03-19 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Do pass and proper for consideration, voting: (6-1-1-0) |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
HB2906 (Replaces) 2020-03-23 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Subjects
Appropriating Monies
Arizona Water Banking Fund
Arizona Water Protection Fund
Budget Bills
Budget Reconciliation
Department Of Environmental Quality
Deq
Environment
Fees
Underground Storage Tank Revolving Fund
Water Quality Assurance Revolving Fund
Arizona Water Banking Fund
Arizona Water Protection Fund
Budget Bills
Budget Reconciliation
Department Of Environmental Quality
Deq
Environment
Fees
Underground Storage Tank Revolving Fund
Water Quality Assurance Revolving Fund