AZ SB1683 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Note: Replaces legislation HB2900
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-28 - Chapter 51
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-28 - Chapter 51
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Criminal justice; budget reconciliation; 2020-2021.
Title
Criminal justice; budget reconciliation; 2020-2021.
Sponsors
Sen. Karen Fann [R] | Sen. David Gowan [R] | Sen. Vince Leach [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-23 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-19 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-19 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (DP/PFC) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-19 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-19 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (DP/PFC) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-28 | Senate | Chapter 51 |
2020-03-28 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2020-03-23 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2020-03-23 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2020-03-23 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (46-14-0-0) |
2020-03-19 | House | Transmit to House |
2020-03-19 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (28-2-0-0) |
2020-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2020-03-19 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Do pass and proper for consideration, voting: (6-1-1-0) |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
HB2900 (Replaces) 2020-03-23 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
Subjects
Arizona Highway Patrol Fund
Budget Bills
Budget Reconciliation
Concealed Firearms
Criminal Justice
Department Of Emergency And Military Affairs
Department Of Public Safety
Doc
Dps
Gang And Immigration Intelligence Team Enforcement Mission
Giitem Fund
State Department Of Corrections
Budget Bills
Budget Reconciliation
Concealed Firearms
Criminal Justice
Department Of Emergency And Military Affairs
Department Of Public Safety
Doc
Dps
Gang And Immigration Intelligence Team Enforcement Mission
Giitem Fund
State Department Of Corrections
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
41 | 1722 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 1724 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 1752 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |