AZ SB1630 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Sex offender management board; establishment
Title
Sex offender management board; establishment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-28 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-28 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2024-03-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2024-03-19 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-03-19 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-03-18 | House | House consent calendar |
2024-03-18 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-3-0-0) |
2024-03-13 | House | House JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2024-03-12 | House | House read second time |
2024-03-04 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2024-03-04 | House | Assigned to House JUD Committee |
2024-03-04 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2024-02-29 | House | Transmit to House |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (24-3-3-0) |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole consent calendar |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-0-1-0) |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Criminal Code - Title 13
Delayed Repeal
Duties
Establishment
Hearing
Notice
Petition
Purpose
Report
Sex Offender Management Board
Sex Offender Management Working Group
Sex Offender Registration
Terminate Sex Offender Registration
Termination
Delayed Repeal
Duties
Establishment
Hearing
Notice
Petition
Purpose
Report
Sex Offender Management Board
Sex Offender Management Working Group
Sex Offender Registration
Terminate Sex Offender Registration
Termination
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
13 | 3826 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
13 | 3828 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |