AZ SB1630 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-13 - Chapter 290
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-13 - Chapter 290
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
School buses; student transportation; vehicles
Title
School buses; student transportation; vehicles
Sponsors
Sen. Sine Kerr [R] | Sen. Paul Boyer [R] | Sen. David Gowan [R] | Sen. Rick Gray [R] |
Sen. Thomas Shope [R] | Sen. Shawnna Bolick [R] | Rep. David Cook [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-06 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 20 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 20 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-18 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 20 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-18 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-13 | Senate | Chapter 290 |
2022-06-13 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2022-06-07 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2022-06-06 | House | House final reading PASSED, voting: (33-20-7-0) |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Senate final reading PASSED, voting: (17-12-1-0) |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Senate Conference adopted |
2022-05-31 | House | House Conference adopted |
2022-05-25 | House | House Conference caucus date |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Senate Conference caucus date |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Senate Minority report |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Senate Conference report: That the Senate accept the House amendments with exceptions and the bill be further amended. |
2022-05-23 | House | House Minority report |
2022-05-18 | Senate | Senate Conference members: QUEZADA has been replaced by MARSH |
2022-05-05 | House | House Conference members: UDALL, BOLICK, PAWLIK |
2022-05-05 | House | House Conference appointed |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Senate Conference members: KERR, GRAY, MARSH |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Senate Conference appointed |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Conference |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee recommended |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2022-04-25 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (37-20-3-0) |
2022-04-19 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2022-04-18 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2022-04-12 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2022-03-29 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-03-29 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-03-28 | House | House consent calendar |
2022-03-28 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0) |
2022-03-22 | House | House ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-3-0-1-0-0) |
2022-03-09 | House | House read second time |
2022-03-08 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2022-03-08 | House | Assigned to House ED Committee |
2022-03-08 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2022-03-04 | House | Transmit to House |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (17-10-3-0) |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Senate ED Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-3-0-0) |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ED Committee |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Allowable Vehicles
Education - Title 15
School Buses
School Transportation
Student Transportation
Transportation
Transportation - Title 28
Vehicles
Education - Title 15
School Buses
School Transportation
Student Transportation
Transportation
Transportation - Title 28
Vehicles
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 383 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 746 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 922 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 925 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 945 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 3053 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 3228 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 900 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |