AZ SB1618 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-13 - House read second time
Pending: House Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-13 - House read second time
Pending: House Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Developmental disabilities; treatment plans; billing
Title
Developmental disabilities; treatment plans; billing
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-07 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Senate - Motion Senator Borrelli moved that a portion of Senate Rule 8A-3 which requires a protest in writing to the Secretary of the Senate during the 48 hour notice period be suspended for the purpose of returning Senate Bill 1618 to the calendar of the Committe (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Senate - Motion Senator Borrelli moved that a portion of Senate Rule 8A-3 which requires a protest in writing to the Secretary of the Senate during the 48 hour notice period be suspended for the purpose of returning Senate Bill 1618 to the calendar of the Committe (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-13 | House | House read second time |
2024-03-12 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2024-03-12 | House | Assigned to House HHS Committee |
2024-03-12 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2024-03-07 | House | Transmit to House |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (24-4-2-0) |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Senate miscellaneous motion: Senator Borrelli moved that a portion of Senate Rule 8A-3 which requires a protest in writing to the Secretary of the Senate during the 48 hour notice period be suspended for the purpose of returning Senate Bill 1618 to the calendar of the Committee of the Whole. Motion carried. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Senate HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Billing
Billing Statements
Developmental Disabilities
Division Duties
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Service And Treatment Plans
Treatment Plans
Verification System
Billing Statements
Developmental Disabilities
Division Duties
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Service And Treatment Plans
Treatment Plans
Verification System