AZ SB1575 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-23 - Senate majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-23 - Senate majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Legislative subpoenas; disobedience
Title
Legislative subpoenas; disobedience
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-2-1-0) |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |