AZ SB1565 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-22 - House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-22 - House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Supreme court; attorney licensing
Title
Supreme court; attorney licensing
Sponsors
Sen. Vince Leach [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-22 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-22 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2022-03-15 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-03-15 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-03-14 | House | House consent calendar |
2022-03-14 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-3-0-0-0-0) |
2022-03-09 | House | House JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-4-0-0-0-0) |
2022-03-01 | House | House read second time |
2022-02-28 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2022-02-28 | House | Assigned to House JUD Committee |
2022-02-28 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2022-02-24 | House | Transmit to House |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-12-2-0) |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-2-1-0) |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |