AZ SB1560 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-18 - Chapter 6
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-18 - Chapter 6
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Public schools; noncertificated personnel; discipline
Title
Public schools; noncertificated personnel; discipline
Sponsors
Sen. Ken Bennett [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-13 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-18 | Senate | Chapter 6 |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2024-03-13 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (52-7-1-0) |
2024-03-12 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-03-12 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-03-04 | House | House consent calendar |
2024-03-04 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2024-02-27 | House | House ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-0-0-0) |
2024-02-22 | House | House read second time |
2024-02-21 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2024-02-21 | House | Assigned to House ED Committee |
2024-02-21 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2024-02-20 | House | Transmit to House |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (28-0-2-0) |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Senate ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ED Committee |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Certificated Persons
Definition
Definitions
Discipline
Education - Title 15
Educator Information System
Noncertificated Personnel
Noncertificated Persons
Personnel List
Public Schools
Reciprocal Discipline
School Employees
Definition
Definitions
Discipline
Education - Title 15
Educator Information System
Noncertificated Personnel
Noncertificated Persons
Personnel List
Public Schools
Reciprocal Discipline
School Employees
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 505 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 534.04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |