AZ SB1556 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House third reading FAILED voting: (23-37-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Civil asset forfeiture; conviction; procedures

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Civil asset forfeiture; conviction; procedures

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-21 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-05-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-21 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-20 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-21HouseHouse third reading FAILED voting: (23-37-0-0)
2020-05-21HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2020-05-21HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2020-05-21HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2020-05-21HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0)
2020-05-20HouseHouse read second time
2020-05-20HouseHouse JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-4-0-0-0-0)
2020-05-19HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2020-05-19HouseAssigned to House JUD Committee
2020-05-19HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2020-03-10HouseTransmit to House
2020-03-10SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0)
2020-03-09SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2020-02-18SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2020-02-18SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2020-02-17SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2020-02-13SenateSenate JUD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-0)
2020-02-05SenateSenate read second time
2020-02-04SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2020-02-04SenateAssigned to Senate JUD Committee
2020-02-04SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
132314Amended CodeSee Bill Text
132314.01Amended CodeSee Bill Text
132314.03Amended CodeSee Bill Text
133413Amended CodeSee Bill Text
133914Amended CodeSee Bill Text
133919Amended CodeSee Bill Text
133920Amended CodeSee Bill Text
133921Amended CodeSee Bill Text
133942Amended CodeSee Bill Text
134301Amended CodeSee Bill Text
134303Amended CodeSee Bill Text
134304Amended CodeSee Bill Text
134305Amended CodeSee Bill Text
134306Amended CodeSee Bill Text
134307Amended CodeSee Bill Text
134308Amended CodeSee Bill Text
134309Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
134310Amended CodeSee Bill Text
134311Amended CodeSee Bill Text
134312Amended CodeSee Bill Text
134314Amended CodeSee Bill Text
134315Amended CodeSee Bill Text
412407Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/73916
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/bills/sb1556p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/bills/sb1556s.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/proposed/s.1556farnsworth e.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/adopted/s.1556jud.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/adopted/s.1556floorfarnsworth e.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=73916&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=73916&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=73916&billStatusActionId=195499&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=73916&billStatusActionId=195646&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=73916&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=73916&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=73916&billStatusActionId=196333&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=73916&billStatusActionId=196350&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback