AZ SB1554 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-05-20 - Assigned to House RULES Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Short-term rental enforcement; penalties

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Short-term rental enforcement; penalties

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-20HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2020-05-20HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2020-03-12HouseTransmit to House
2020-03-12SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (23-5-2-0)
2020-03-12SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2020-02-25SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2020-02-25SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2020-02-24SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2020-02-20SenateSenate COM Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-3-0-0)
2020-02-05SenateSenate read second time
2020-02-04SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2020-02-04SenateAssigned to Senate COM Committee
2020-02-04SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
11269.17Amended CodeSee Bill Text
421125.02Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9500.39Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/73914
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/bills/sb1554p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/bills/sb1554s.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/proposed/s.1554ugenti-rita.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/adopted/s.1554com.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/adopted/s.1554floorbrophy mcgee2.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=73914&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=73914&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=73914&billStatusActionId=195767&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=73914&billStatusActionId=195774&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback