AZ SB1551 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - House read second time
Pending: House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - House read second time
Pending: House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Energy; water; savings accounts
Title
Energy; water; savings accounts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFCA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources and Energy Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFCA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources and Energy Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | House read second time |
2020-03-10 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-03-10 | House | Assigned to House NREW Committee |
2020-03-10 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2020-02-20 | House | Transmit to House |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (26-0-4-0) |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration Amended, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Senate NRE Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-0-1-0) |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Assigned to Senate NRE Committee |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Cities And Towns - Title 9
Counties - Title 11
Definitions
Department Of Administration
Education - Title 15
Energy And Water Efficiency Fund
Guaranteed Energy Cost Savings Contracts
Procurement Practices
Program For School Energy
Public Buildings And Improvements - Title 34
Savings Accounts
Water
Water Use Efficiency Programs
Counties - Title 11
Definitions
Department Of Administration
Education - Title 15
Energy And Water Efficiency Fund
Guaranteed Energy Cost Savings Contracts
Procurement Practices
Program For School Energy
Public Buildings And Improvements - Title 34
Savings Accounts
Water
Water Use Efficiency Programs
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 254.08 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 213.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 213.02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 910.02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
34 | 105 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
9 | 499.16 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |