AZ SB1550 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular
Note: Legislation replaced by HB2751
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on May 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-25 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-25 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Budget procedures; budget reconciliation; 2019-2020
Title
Budget procedures; budget reconciliation; 2019-2020
Sponsors
Sen. Karen Fann [R] | Sen. Sonny Borrelli [R] | Sen. David Gowan [R] | Sen. Rick Gray [R] |
Sen. Vince Leach [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2019-05-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-4-0-0) |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
HB2751 (Replaced by) 2019-05-31 - Chapter 267
Subjects
Appropriating Monies
Budget Bills
Budget Procedures
Budget Reconciliation
Elections And Electors - Title 16
Information Technology - Title 18
Motor Vehicle Pool Consolidation Fund
Public Finances - Title 35
State Budget Procedures
State Government - Title 41
Taxation - Title 42
Transportation - Title 28
Voter Registration System Fund
Budget Bills
Budget Procedures
Budget Reconciliation
Elections And Electors - Title 16
Information Technology - Title 18
Motor Vehicle Pool Consolidation Fund
Public Finances - Title 35
State Budget Procedures
State Government - Title 41
Taxation - Title 42
Transportation - Title 28
Voter Registration System Fund
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 168.01 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
18 | 305 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
18 | 401 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
18 | 421 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 414 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
35 | 112 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
35 | 113 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
35 | 173 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 5356 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 704 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 740.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 1122 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |