AZ SB1542 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-20 - Chapter 234
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-20 - Chapter 234
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Group homes; electronic monitoring
Title
Group homes; electronic monitoring
Sponsors
Sen. Nancy Barto [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-18 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-16 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-16 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-16 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-16 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-20 | Senate | Chapter 234 |
2022-05-20 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2022-05-18 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-05-18 | Senate | Senate final reading PASSED, voting: (25-0-5-0) |
2022-05-18 | Senate | Senate concurs |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee recommended |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Conference |
2022-05-16 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2022-05-16 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (52-1-7-0) |
2022-05-16 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2022-03-22 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-03-22 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-03-21 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0) |
2022-03-14 | House | House HHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-1-0-1-0-0) |
2022-03-09 | House | House read second time |
2022-03-08 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2022-03-08 | House | Assigned to House HHS Committee |
2022-03-08 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2022-03-04 | House | Transmit to House |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (27-0-3-0) |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Senate HHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-0-0-0) |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |