AZ SB1521 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Event tickets; transferability
Title
Event tickets; transferability
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Senate COM Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-1-1-0) |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Assigned to Senate COM Committee |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Allowable Actions
Enforcement
Event Tickets
Ticket Issuers
Ticket Platform
Trade And Commerce - Title 44
Trade Practices
Transferability
Use Of Nontransferable Ticketing System
Enforcement
Event Tickets
Ticket Issuers
Ticket Platform
Trade And Commerce - Title 44
Trade Practices
Transferability
Use Of Nontransferable Ticketing System