AZ SB1519 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-01 - Assigned to House RULES Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-01 - Assigned to House RULES Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
School safety; protective orders; appropriations
Title
School safety; protective orders; appropriations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate - Sen Quezada to include the Farley flr amend. ( ref Comps) (Y: 13 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate - Sen Quezada to include the Cajero Bedford flr amend. ( ref Comps) (Y: 13 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Public Safety Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate - Sen Quezada to include the Farley flr amend. ( ref Comps) (Y: 13 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate - Sen Quezada to include the Cajero Bedford flr amend. ( ref Comps) (Y: 13 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Public Safety Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-01 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2018-05-01 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2018-05-01 | House | Assigned to House JPS Committee |
2018-05-01 | House | Assigned to House JPS Committee |
2018-05-01 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2018-05-01 | House | Transmit to House |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (17-13-0-0) |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Senate motion to amend |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Senate motion to amend |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Senate COMPS Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (4-3-1-0) |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Assigned to Senate COMPS Committee |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Annual Report
Appropriating Monies
Appropriations
Center For School Safety
Child Safety - Title 8
Courts And Civil Proceedings - Title 12
Criminal Code - Title 13
Education - Title 15
Emergency Response Plan
Firearm Possession
Protective Order
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Public Safety
School Safety
Schools
Severe Threat Order Of Protection
State Government - Title 41
Suicide Prevention Training
Appropriating Monies
Appropriations
Center For School Safety
Child Safety - Title 8
Courts And Civil Proceedings - Title 12
Criminal Code - Title 13
Education - Title 15
Emergency Response Plan
Firearm Possession
Protective Order
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Public Safety
School Safety
Schools
Severe Threat Order Of Protection
State Government - Title 41
Suicide Prevention Training
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
13 | 2703 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
13 | 3101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 118 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 153 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 153.01 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 154 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 341 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 503 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 2907.14 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 519 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 1711 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 1715 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 1750 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 1822 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
8 | 202 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
8 | 208 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |