AZ SB1506 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - House read second time
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - House read second time
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Low-income multifamily housing; valuation
Title
Low-income multifamily housing; valuation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | House | House read second time |
2020-03-05 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-03-05 | House | Assigned to House WM Committee |
2020-03-05 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2020-03-03 | House | Transmit to House |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0) |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-3-0) |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Appeals
Class Four Property
Confidentiality
Definitions
Evidentiary Requirements
Low-income Housing Tax Credit Program
Low-income Multifamily Housing
Low-income Multifamily Residential Rental Property
Property Tax
Taxation - Title 42
Valuation
Class Four Property
Confidentiality
Definitions
Evidentiary Requirements
Low-income Housing Tax Credit Program
Low-income Multifamily Housing
Low-income Multifamily Residential Rental Property
Property Tax
Taxation - Title 42
Valuation