AZ SB1498 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Chapter 147
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Chapter 147
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Egg promotion program
Title
Egg promotion program
Sponsors
Sen. Sine Kerr [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - House Land & Agriculture Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources and Energy Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - House Land & Agriculture Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources and Energy Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-29 | Senate | Chapter 147 |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Senate final reading PASSED, voting: (26-4-0-0) |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Senate concurs |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee recommended |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Conference |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2019-04-16 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (48-12-0-0) |
2019-04-16 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2019-04-09 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-04-09 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-04-08 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-2-0-0-0-0) |
2019-03-28 | House | House LAG Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (5-0-0-2-0-0) |
2019-03-26 | House | Assigned to House LAG Committee |
2019-03-26 | House | House NREW Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0) |
2019-02-27 | House | House read second time |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to House NREW Committee |
2019-02-26 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2019-02-21 | House | Transmit to House |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-1-0-0) |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Senate NRE Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-1-0) |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Assigned to Senate NRE Committee |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
3 | 710 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
3 | 717 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |