AZ SB1494 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-07 - Chapter 318
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Marijuana; testing; advisory council; library

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Marijuana; testing; advisory council; library

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-27 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-27 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-27 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-07SenateChapter 318
2019-06-07SenateGovernor Signed
2019-05-28SenateTransmitted to Governor
2019-05-27SenateSenate final reading PASSED, voting: (28-0-2-0)
2019-05-27SenateSenate concurs
2019-05-27SenateSenate minority caucus: Conference
2019-05-27SenateSenate Conference Committee recommended
2019-05-27SenateTransmit to Senate
2019-05-27HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (60-0-0-0)
2019-05-27HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2019-04-30HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2019-04-30HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2019-04-25HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0)
2019-03-29HouseHouse HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-1-0-0)
2019-03-19HouseHouse read second time
2019-03-18HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2019-03-18HouseAssigned to House HHS Committee
2019-03-18HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2019-03-06HouseTransmit to House
2019-03-06SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0)
2019-03-05SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2019-02-28SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Retained
2019-02-27SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-27SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-27SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2019-02-20SenateSenate HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0)
2019-02-06SenateSenate read second time
2019-02-05SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2019-02-05SenateAssigned to Senate HHS Committee
2019-02-05SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
362801Amended CodeSee Bill Text
362803Amended CodeSee Bill Text
362803.01New CodeSee Bill Text
362804.01Amended CodeSee Bill Text
362804.05Amended CodeSee Bill Text
362804.06Amended CodeSee Bill Text
362804.07New CodeSee Bill Text
362806Amended CodeSee Bill Text
362810Amended CodeSee Bill Text
362816Amended CodeSee Bill Text
362819Amended CodeSee Bill Text
362820New CodeSee Bill Text
362821New CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/72146
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/sb1494p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/sb1494s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/sb1494h.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/laws/0318.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/adopted/s.1494floorgowan.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72146&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72146&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72146&billStatusActionId=187360&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72146&billStatusActionId=187752&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72146&billStatusActionId=187941&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72146&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72146&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72146&billStatusActionId=189897&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72146&billStatusActionId=189900&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72146&billStatusActionId=189947&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72146&billStatusActionId=189959&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback