AZ SB1494 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Chapter 170
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Environment; underground injection control program

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Environment; underground injection control program

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-03 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 23 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - House - House Energy, Environment and Natural Resources Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-10SenateChapter 170
2018-04-10SenateGovernor Signed
2018-04-04SenateTransmitted to Governor
2018-04-04SenateTransmit to Senate
2018-04-03HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (34-23-3-0)
2018-04-03HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2018-03-13HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-13HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-12HouseHouse consent calendar
2018-03-12HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-3-0-0)
2018-03-06HouseHouse EENR Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-3-0-0-0-0)
2018-02-26HouseHouse read second time
2018-02-22HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2018-02-22HouseAssigned to House EENR Committee
2018-02-22HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2018-02-20HouseTransmit to House
2018-02-20SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (17-13-0-0)
2018-02-19SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2018-02-13SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-13SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-12SenateSenate consent calendar
2018-02-12SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2018-02-05SenateSenate NREW Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-3-0-0)
2018-02-01SenateSenate read second time
2018-01-31SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-01-31SenateAssigned to Senate NREW Committee
2018-01-31SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
49203Amended CodeSee Bill Text
49210Amended CodeSee Bill Text
49250Amended CodeSee Bill Text
49261Amended CodeSee Bill Text
49262Amended CodeSee Bill Text
49263Amended CodeSee Bill Text
49264Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/70705
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/sb1494p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/sb1494s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/laws/0170.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/s.1494floorgriffin.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70705&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70705&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70705&billStatusActionId=181113&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70705&billStatusActionId=181251&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70705&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70705&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70705&billStatusActionId=182909&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70705&billStatusActionId=182916&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback