AZ SB1471 | 2012 | Fiftieth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-13 - Referred to House JUD Committee
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-13 - Referred to House JUD Committee
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Criminal background checks; employees
Title
Criminal background checks; employees
Sponsors
Sen. Linda Gray [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-06 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - Senate - Senate Public Safety and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - Senate - Senate Public Safety and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-13 | Referred to House JUD Committee | |
2012-03-13 | House read second time | |
2012-03-12 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2012-03-12 | Assigned to House JUD Committee | |
2012-03-12 | Introduced in House and read first time | |
2012-03-06 | Transmit to House | |
2012-03-06 | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (24-5-1-0) | |
2012-03-05 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2012-03-01 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-03-01 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-03-01 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2012-01-31 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-02-28 | Senate JUD Committee action: Withdrawn | |
2012-01-31 | Referred to Senate JUD Committee | |
2012-02-15 | Senate PSHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-0-1-0) | |
2012-02-01 | Referred to Senate PSHS Committee | |
2012-02-01 | Senate read second time | |
2012-01-31 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-01-31 | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee | |
2012-01-31 | Assigned to Senate PSHS Committee | |
2012-01-31 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |